Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Jerónimo Hermosilla, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1800BornSanto Domingo de La Calzada, Spain
29 Oct 182323.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
182726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Aug 183938.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
2 Aug 183938.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
25 Apr 184140.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
1 Nov 186161.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
20 May 1906Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Jerónimo Hermosilla:
Bishop St. Jerónimo Hermosilla O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 150, Number 821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013