Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilarión Alcázar, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1818BornVillatobas, Spain
15 Jan 183416.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Jan 184123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Sep 184830.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
5 Sep 184830.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
8 Apr 184931.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
1 Nov 186143.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
15 Oct 187052.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Hilarión Alcázar:
Bishop Hilarión Alcázar O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 438
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 157, Number 862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013