Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernabé García Cezón, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1834BornHuerta de Valdecarabanos, Spain
16 Dec 185521.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Sep 186430.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
9 Sep 186430.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
16 Apr 186531.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
Nov 187945.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
20 Oct 189965.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Bernabé García Cezón:
Bishop Bernabé García Cezón O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d?: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013