Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Chinchón, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

Titular Bishop of Rosalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1838Born
18 Dec 185618.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Feb 186022.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Dec 188345.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China
11 Dec 188345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
27 Apr 188446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
1 May 189254.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

MicroData Summary for Andrés Chinchón
Bishop Andrés Chinchón O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Amoy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOcaña, Spain
Ordained BishopManila, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 484
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017