Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Payo y Piñeiro, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1814Born
28 Jan 187661.3AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Mar 187661.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
1 Jan 188974.2DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pedro Payo y Piñeiro
Archbishop Pedro Payo y Piñeiro O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Coruña, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 45, Number 32
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017