Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Romero, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1812Born
5 Jan 187663.7SelectedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Jan 187663.8ConfirmedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
11 Jun 187664.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
7 Oct 188573.5DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Benito Romero
Bishop Benito Romero O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadridejos, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSt Francois, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,540
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 417
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 46, Number 35
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017