Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Cuartero y Medina, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1813Born
24 Mar 182916.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Jun 186754.2SelectedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
20 Sep 186754.4ConfirmedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
30 Nov 186754.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jaro, Philippines
25 Apr 186855.0InstalledBishop of Jaro, Philippines
16 Jul 188471.3DiedBishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mariano Cuartero y Medina (VIAF: 87940764)
Bishop Mariano Cuartero y Medina O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrescano, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain, Spain
Ordained BishopDominican Church, Ocaña

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 174, Number 957
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017