Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Cardinal García Cuesta

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1803Born
1 Mar 182824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
14 Nov 184744.1SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
14 Apr 184844.5ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
16 Jul 184844.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
14 May 185147.6SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
5 Sep 185147.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
27 Sep 186157.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 186258.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
14 Apr 187369.5DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel García Cuesta (VIAF: 88961867)
Miguel Cardinal García Cuesta (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacotera, Diocese of Salamanca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Diocese of Valladolid
Buried Place (Original)Crypt of the Archbishops, Cathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 219, and Page 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 156, Number 852
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017