Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ávila Lamas

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1803BornTuy
1830¹26.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 185248.4SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
27 Sep 185248.9ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
2 Jan 185349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
1 Aug 185753.7SelectedBishop of Orense, Spain
25 Sep 185753.9ConfirmedBishop of Orense, Spain
2 Jan 186662.1DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Ávila Lamas:
Bishop José Ávila Lamas (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 134, and Page 458
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 161, Number 886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013