Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Lorenzo Varela Temes

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1776Born
20 May 182447.6SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
12 Jul 182447.8ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
7 Nov 182448.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
21 Mar 184972.5DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Lorenzo Varela Temes
Bishop Agustín Lorenzo Varela Temes (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSabadelle

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 141, Number 763
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast