Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Díaz de la Caneja y Sosa

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1779Born
2 Jan 184868.4SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
17 Jan 184868.4ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
16 Jul 184868.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
20 Nov 185677.3DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Díaz de la Caneja y Sosa
Bishop Ignacio Díaz de la Caneja y Sosa (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOseja de Sajambre
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Diocese of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • ob/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 431
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 155, Number 851
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast