Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Rivadeneyra

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1774Born
1800¹25.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 183056.3SelectedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
28 Feb 183156.8ConfirmedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
15 May 183157.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
26 Jun 185682.2DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Rivadeneyra
Bishop Juan Antonio Rivadeneyra (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLameiro

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 802
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast