Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Barbajero y Villar

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1792Born
16 May 181825.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 184855.3SelectedBishop of León, Spain
17 Jan 184855.4ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
16 Jul 184855.9Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
26 Feb 186370.5DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Barbajero y Villar
Bishop Joaquín Barbajero y Villar (born , died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Romón de la Hornija
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Diocese of Valladolid

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 156, Number 853
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017