Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Garcia Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1802BornPradillo de Cameros
25 Jun 185856.1AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
3 Oct 185856.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
6 Oct 186462.4DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nepomuceno Garcia Gómez:
Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Garcia Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 166, Number 915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013