Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Llorente y Montón

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1797Born
1822²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 184749.8SelectedBishop of Gerona, Spain
17 Dec 184750.1ConfirmedBishop of Gerona, Spain
5 Mar 184850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
17 Jan 186264.1DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Florencio Llorente y Montón
Bishop Florencio Llorente y Montón (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeruel
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palencia, Diocese of Palencia

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 153, Number 836
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017