Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Castañer y Rivas

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1806Born
7 Oct 185751.1SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
21 Dec 185751.4ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
18 Apr 185851.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
18 May 186558.8DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Castañer y Rivas
Bishop Juan José Castañer y Rivas (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Torelló, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 589
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 166, Number 912
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017