Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Palau y Térmens

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1806Born
1831¹24.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185347.1SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
22 Dec 185347.4ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
23 Apr 185447.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
20 Aug 185751.0SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
25 Sep 185751.1ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
8 Jul 186255.9DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Palau y Térmens (VIAF: 305127603)
Bishop Antonio Palau y Térmens (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValls, Archdiocese of Tarragona
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Mar, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 589
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 163, Number 893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017