Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Domingo Costa y Borrás

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1805BornVinaroz
12 Sep 184742.7SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
17 Dec 184742.9ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
19 Mar 184843.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
16 Jul 184944.5SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
7 Jan 185045.0ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
20 Jun 185752.4SelectedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
3 Aug 185752.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
14 Apr 186459.3DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Domingo Costa y Borrás:
Archbishop José Domingo Costa y Borrás (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 536
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 153, Number 837

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013