Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Raimundo Benito Vilamitjana y Vila

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1812Born
30 Jun 186148.7SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
23 Dec 186149.2ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
4 May 186249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
31 Dec 187866.2SelectedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
28 Feb 187966.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
3 Sep 188875.9DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Raimundo Benito Vilamitjana y Vila (VIAF: 304650486)
Archbishop José Raimundo Benito Vilamitjana y Vila (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vicente de Torelló, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopN. Sen. del Carmen, Vic, Diocese of Vic

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 243, and Page 537
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 169, Number 932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017