Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Aznar y Pueyo

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1821BornPanticosa
31 Dec 187857.6SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
28 Feb 187957.7ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
6 Jul 187958.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
29 Jun 189372.1DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Aznar y Pueyo:
Bishop Francisco Aznar y Pueyo (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013