Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Fernández y Lafita

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1809Born
21 Dec 183324.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 187464.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
24 Jan 187565.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
29 Sep 189081.0DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Fernández y Lafita
Bishop Ramón Fernández y Lafita (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBailo, Diocese of Jaca
Ordained BishopS. Isidro, Madrid

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 41, Number 9
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Mar 2017