Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás Costa y Fornaguera

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1831BornCalella de la Costa
6 Jun 185725.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 187544.2SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
23 Sep 187544.2ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
23 Jan 187644.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
27 May 188957.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
10 Oct 191180.3DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Costa y Fornaguera:
Archbishop Tomás Costa y Fornaguera (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 320, and Page 537
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 44, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015