Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Sivilla y Gener

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1817Born
15 Dec 187760.1SelectedBishop of Gerona, Spain
31 Dec 187760.2ConfirmedBishop of Gerona, Spain
12 May 187860.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
8 Jan 190688.2DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Sivilla y Gener (VIAF: 304845654)
Bishop Tomás Sivilla y Gener (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalella de la Costa, Diocese of Gerona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017