Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Nolasco Colomer y Mestres

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1822Born
1845²22.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 187553.4SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
17 Sep 187553.6ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
16 Jan 187653.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
30 Aug 188159.5DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Nolasco Colomer y Mestres (VIAF: 89548908)
Bishop Pedro Nolasco Colomer y Mestres (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerona, Diocese of Gerona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gerona, Diocese of Gerona

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 589
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 44, Number 25
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017