Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Valls y Pascual

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1822Born
18 Sep 184725.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 187553.4SelectedBishop of Gerona, Spain
23 Sep 187553.5ConfirmedBishop of Gerona, Spain
9 Jan 187653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
11 Sep 187755.5DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Valls y Pascual
Bishop Isidoro Valls y Pascual (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSallent, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 44, Number 24
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017