Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Constantino Bonet y Zanuy

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1808Born
21 May 186254.1AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
19 Oct 186254.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
2 Jul 187567.3SelectedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 Sep 187567.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
10 Oct 187870.5DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Constantino Bonet y Zanuy (VIAF: 304887971)
Archbishop Constantino Bonet y Zanuy (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTamarite de Litera, Diocese of Lérida
Ordained BishopBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 285, and Page 537
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 170, Number 937
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017