Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Barajas y Moreno

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1795Born
25 Feb 182428.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185459.0AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
18 Mar 185559.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
24 Apr 185559.4InstalledBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
30 Dec 186873.1DiedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro Barajas y Moreno (VIAF: 255048761)
Bishop Pedro Barajas y Moreno (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 353
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016