Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Mateo Guerra y Alba

Deceased

Bishop of Zacatecas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1804Born
27 Dec 182723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
7 Apr 186257.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
7 Apr 186257.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
19 Mar 186358.4AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
28 Feb 186459.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
12 Jun 186459.7InstalledBishop of Zacatecas, México
7 Jun 187166.7DiedBishop of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Mateo Guerra y Alba
Bishop Ignacio Mateo Guerra y Alba (born , died ) Bishop of Zacatecas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagos, Diocese of Zacatecas
Ordained BishopSanta Teresa la Antigua, Mexico

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 366, and Page 600
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017