Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos María Colina y Rubio

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1813Born
12 Mar 183723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Mar 183723.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 185440.4AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
20 Aug 185440.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
19 Mar 186349.3AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
7 Feb 186450.2InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
10 Mar 187965.3DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Colina y Rubio (VIAF: 304920135)
Bishop Carlos María Colina y Rubio (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,395
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 200, and Page 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017