Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Manuel Ladrón de Guevara

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1804Born
183328.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 186358.3AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 May 186459.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
6 Aug 186964.7InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
28 Aug 186964.8DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Carlos Manuel Ladrón de Guevara
Bishop Carlos Manuel Ladrón de Guevara (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZongolica
Ordained BishopCathedral, Puebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 200
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017