Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Fermín Márquez y Carrizosa

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1811Born
19 Sep 183524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
22 Jun 186856.9AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
21 Dec 186857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
1 Jan 188775.4DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Vicente Fermín Márquez y Carrizosa
Bishop Vicente Fermín Márquez y Carrizosa (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYanhuitlán, Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tlaxcala, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Feb 2017