Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa

Dioecesis Chilpancingensis-Chilapensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alejo Zavala Castro, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 20 October 1989
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Acapulco
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Guerrero
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 19,970 (7,713 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sur
  • Official Web Site: http://www.chilpancingo-chilapa.org/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Abasolo e Hidalgo 3, Col. Centro, 39000 Chilpancingo, Gro., México
  • Telephone: (747)471-05-92
  • Fax: 491-64-12

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chilapa
16 March 1863ErectedArchdiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala
Diocese of Chilapa (erected)
18 March 1958Territory LostDiocese of Chilapa Diocese of Acapulco (erected)
27 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Acapulco
Diocese of Chilapa
Diocese of Tacámbaro
Diocese of Toluca
Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano (erected)
Diocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa
20 October 1989Name ChangedDiocese of Chilapa Diocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa
4 January 1992Territory LostDiocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa Diocese of Tlapa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chilapa
1950815,000820,00099.4%1221226,6804780ap1951
1966550,000562,00097.9%9781055,238811366ap1967
1970713,522752,52294.8%1181186,04659ap1971
1976805,500996,70080.8%11061166,943615373ap1977
19801,310,0001,405,00093.2%119612510,480912178ap1981
Diocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa
19901,503,0001,550,00097.0%122813011,561814883ap1991
1997872,869969,52190.0%98141127,793142887ap2001
2001825,000900,00091.7%106141206,875142891ap2002
2002825,000900,00091.7%116211376,0211211282ap2003
2003825,000900,00091.7%118161346,1561617086ap2004
2004825,000900,00091.7%123161395,9351617089ap2005
2006836,000913,00091.6%138161545,4281617073ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013