Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Hernández González

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1927Born
25 Mar 195023.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 198356.0AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
26 Apr 198356.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
18 Nov 198962.8AppointedBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
18 Jan 199063.0InstalledBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
8 Jul 200376.4RetiredBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
19 Jan 201588.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México

MicroData Summary for José María Hernández González
Bishop José María Hernández González (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Netzahualcóyotl

EventPlace
Birth PlacePénjamo

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 502
  • d: CB, 20 Jan 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018