Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Acapulco

Archidioecesis Acapulcanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Carlos Garfias Merlos, Archbishop
  • Felipe Aguirre Franco, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 February 1983
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Guerrero
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 18,603 (7,185 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sur
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisacapulco.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Quebrado 16, 39300 Acapulco, Gro., Mexico
  • Telephone: (744)483-05-63
  • Fax: 482-07-63

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Acapulco
18 March 1958ErectedDiocese of Chilapa Diocese of Acapulco (erected)
27 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Acapulco
Diocese of Chilapa
Diocese of Tacámbaro
Diocese of Toluca
Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano (erected)
Archdiocese of Acapulco
10 February 1983ElevatedDiocese of Acapulco Archdiocese of Acapulco

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Acapulco
1958400,000.0%3636023ap1960
1963432,000450,00096.0%3223412,705912634ap1967
1970432,000450,00096.0%393911,076913736ap1971
1976722,000750,00096.3%4885612,8921915443ap1977
1980828,000932,00088.8%56106612,54562115047ap1981
Archdiocese of Acapulco
19902,620,0003,100,00084.5%57106739,104121812755ap1991
19992,730,0002,860,00095.5%841610027,300163621781ap2000
20002,740,0003,860,00071.0%911610725,607152820080ap2001
20012,795,0003,900,00071.7%891810726,121163020082ap2002
20022,836,0003,955,00071.7%901810826,259202020484ap2003
20032,860,0003,965,00072.1%951811325,309203018384ap2004
20042,865,0003,970,00072.2%891910826,527203117186ap2005
20052,908,0004,030,00072.2%921911126,198203114078ap2006
20062,940,0004,074,00072.2%892311226,250193514078ap2007
20113,049,0004,244,00071.8%1072212923,635223315084ap2012
20123,074,0004,258,00072.2%1062012624,396212118784ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013