Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tacámbaro

Dioecesis Tacambarensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 26 July 1913
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Morelia
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Michoacán
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 14,624 (5,648 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Don Vasco
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdetacambaro.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Maria Zendejas 69, 61650, Tacámbaro, Mich., México
  • Telephone: (459)596-00-44
  • Fax: 596-07-30

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
26 July 1913ErectedArchdiocese of Michoacán
Diocese of Zamora
Diocese of Tacámbaro (erected)
2 May 1953Territory LostDiocese of Tacámbaro (Aquila, Coahuayana, and Villa Victoria) Diocese of Colima
30 April 1962Territory LostDiocese of Colima (Aquila, Coahuayana, and Villa Victoria)
Diocese of Tacámbaro (Acahuato, Aguililla, Apatzingán, Arteaga, Buenavista Tomatlán, Coacolmán, Coire, Nueva Italia, Lombardy, Parácuaro, Tepalcatepec, and Tumbiscatio)
Diocese of Apatzingán (erected)
27 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Acapulco (La Union, Coahuayutla, and Zihuatanejo)
Diocese of Chilapa (Zirandaro, Coyuca-de-Catalan, Pungarabato or Ciudad Altamirano, Cutzamala, Tlapehuala, Tlalchapa, Ajuchitlan, San Miguel Totolapan, and Arcelia)
Diocese of Toluca (Tlatlaya, Amatepec, Tejupilco, Sultepec, Otzoloapan, and Zacazonapan)
Diocese of Tacámbaro (San Lucas and Huetamo)
Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano (erected)
12 February 1965Territory AddedArchdiocese of Morelia (Villa Escalante or Santa Clara and Villa Madero) Diocese of Tacámbaro
22 June 1972Territory AddedArchdiocese of Morelia (Enandio and Quanoro (in Benito Juárez)) Diocese of Tacámbaro
3 July 1987Territory LostDiocese of Tacámbaro (Enandio and Guarnoro) Archdiocese of Morelia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950212,435212,74399.9%362385,5901926ap1951
196595,000158,49159.9%459541,75928517ap1967
1968228,725233,50098.0%583613,749410920ap1971
1976240,000245,40097.8%52524,61510831ap1977
1980275,000281,33497.7%611624,43519033ap1981
1990342,587349,57998.0%771784,392112339ap1991
1999374,120387,22796.6%752774,858213032ap2000
2000374,170381,80698.0%852874,300213732ap2001
2001367,152373,66398.3%862884,172214032ap2002
2002357,435374,74595.4%742764,703215033ap2003
2003336,058365,28092.0%811824,098113033ap2004
2004335,121360,34593.0%851863,896112933ap2005
2010346,000362,00095.6%942963,604313341ap2011
2014358,000374,00095.7%852874,114212941ap2015
2017368,700384,86095.8%87874,23712942ap2018
2020299,300324,58592.2%91913,28911542ap2021
2022317,729340,82893.2%84843,7829142ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 611, and Page 612
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 554, and Page 555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 8 Jun 2024