Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Abraham Martínez Betancourt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1903Born
28 Oct 192825.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 194037.3AppointedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
20 Oct 194037.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
5 Jun 197976.2RetiredBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
8 Apr 198279.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José Abraham Martínez Betancourt
Bishop José Abraham Martínez Betancourt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeribán
Ordained BishopTacámbaro, Diocese of Tacámbaro, Michoacán

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 69
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast