Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gabriel Anaya y Diez de Bonilla

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán

Titular Bishop of Rusguniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1895BornTepexpan
3 Apr 192025.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 194751.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
25 May 194752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
15 Sep 196772.4ResignedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
15 Sep 196772.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
6 Jan 197680.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José Gabriel Anaya y Diez de Bonilla:
Bishop José Gabriel Anaya y Diez de Bonilla (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015