Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Méndez Arceo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México


from the Diocese of Cuernavaca Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1907Born
28 Oct 193427.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 195244.3AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
30 Apr 195244.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
28 Dec 198275.1RetiredBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
6 Feb 199284.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Sergio Méndez Arceo
Bishop Sergio Méndez Arceo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuernavaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTlalpan

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018