Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pablo Rovalo Azcué, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zacatecas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1925Born
22 Dec 195126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
18 May 197045.1AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
12 Aug 197045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
15 Jul 197247.2ResignedBishop of Zacatecas, México
30 Sep 199974.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for José Pablo Rovalo Azcué
Bishop José Pablo Rovalo Azcué S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zacatecas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico
Ordained BishopNuestra Senora del Patronicimo, Church, Zacatecas, Diocese of Zacatecas

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 608

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast