Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillermo Tritschler y Córdoba

Deceased

Archbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1878BornSan Andrés Chalchicomula
19 Jun 190425.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 193152.5AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
22 Apr 193152.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
15 May 193152.8InstalledBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
22 Feb 194162.6AppointedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
20 Jun 194162.9InstalledArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
29 Jul 195274.0DiedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Tritschler y Córdoba:
Archbishop Guillermo Tritschler y Córdoba (born , died ) Archbishop of Monterrey

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015