Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Tritschler y Córdoba

Deceased

Archbishop of Yucatán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1868Born
19 Dec 189123.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 190032.2AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
18 Nov 190032.4Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
1 Dec 190032.5InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
11 Nov 190638.4AppointedArchbishop of Yucatán, México
15 Nov 194274.4DiedArchbishop of Yucatán, México

MicroData Summary for Martín Tritschler y Córdoba
Archbishop Martín Tritschler y Córdoba (born , died ) Archbishop of Yucatán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Andrés Chalchicomula

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018