Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Fernández Arteaga

Archbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1933 BornSanta Inés
4 Apr 195723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
13 Jul 197440.8AppointedBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
12 Sep 197441.0Ordained BishopBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
8 Feb 198046.4AppointedBishop of Colima, México
20 Dec 198855.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Chihuahua, México
25 Jan 198955.3InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Chihuahua, México
24 Jun 199157.7SucceededArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
29 Sep 200976.0RetiredArchbishop of Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for José Fernández Arteaga:
Archbishop José Fernández Arteaga (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Chihuahua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015