Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Chihuahua

Archidioecesis Chihuahuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 November 1958
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Chihuahua
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 73,956 (28,565 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquichi.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 7, Av. Cuauhtémoc 1828, 31020 Chihuahua, Chih., México
  • Telephone: (614)410-32-02/3
  • Fax: 410-56-21

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chihuahua
23 June 1891ErectedDiocese of Durango Diocese of Chihuahua (erected)
6 May 1950Territory LostDiocese of Chihuahua Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tarahumara (erected)
10 April 1957Territory LostDiocese of Chihuahua Diocese of Ciudad Juárez (erected)
Archdiocese of Chihuahua
22 November 1958ElevatedDiocese of Chihuahua Archdiocese of Chihuahua
25 April 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Chihuahua
Diocese of Ciudad Juárez
Diocese of Ciudad Obregón
Territorial Prelature of Madera (erected)
11 May 1992Territory LostArchdiocese of Chihuahua Diocese of Parral (erected)
17 November 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Chihuahua
Territorial Prelature of Madera
Diocese of Cuauhtémoc-Madera (Name Changed and Elevated to a Diocese)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chihuahua
1950815,000836,00097.5%6133948,6703321053ap1951
Archdiocese of Chihuahua
1966610,500667,90191.4%87211085,6522732941ap1967
1970768,000799,90296.0%107231305,9073734649ap1971
1976963,360999,33696.4%85231088,9202828955ap1977
19801,037,4911,090,71895.1%81189910,4792726454ap1981
19901,940,4382,180,37489.0%882311117,481123622665ap1991
1999935,7011,039,66890.0%86301168,06693917553ap2000
2000954,4151,060,46190.0%85311168,22794318261ap2001
2001973,5031,081,67090.0%77311089,01384418962ap2002
2002992,9731,103,30390.0%85321178,48684518862ap2003
2003990,3261,125,37088.0%86291158,61183719062ap2004
20041,010,1331,285,62478.6%78281069,52983319262ap2005
20061,176,0001,321,00089.0%102291318,977103818559ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Apr 2013