Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Constancio Miranda Wechmann

Archbishop of Chihuahua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1952 BornLas Cruces
30 Sep 197725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Madera, Chihuahua, México
27 Jun 199845.8AppointedBishop of Atlacomulco, México, México
4 Aug 199845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Atlacomulco, México, México
29 Sep 200957.0AppointedArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
19 Nov 200957.2InstalledArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
5 Jan 201259.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Parral, Chihuahua, México
27 Jun 201259.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Parral, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Constancio Miranda Wechmann:
Archbishop Constancio Miranda Wechmann (born ) Archbishop of Chihuahua

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Chihuahua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013