Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Patiño Velázquez, M. S. F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1938Born
16 Jun 196324.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 198142.5AppointedBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
21 May 198142.6Ordained BishopBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
17 Nov 201476.1RetiredBishop of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México
21 Sep 201980.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Apatzingán, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Miguel Patiño Velázquez
Bishop Miguel Patiño Velázquez M. S. F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apatzingán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Piedad
Ordained BishopCathedral, Apatzingán, Diocese of Apatzingán, Michoacán
Death PlaceUruapán
Buried Place (Original)Foot of, Virgen de Guadalupe Altar, Cathedral, Apatzingán, Diocese of Apatzingán, Michoacán

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2014
  • d: CB, 22 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast