Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Colima

Dioecesis Colimensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 December 1881
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guadalajara
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Colima
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 11,391 (4,399 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Occidente
  • Mailing Address: Palacio Episcopal, Hidalgo 135, Apdo. 1, 28000 Colima, Col., México
  • Telephone: (312)312-02-62
  • Fax: 312-43-44

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 December 1881ErectedArchdiocese of Guadalajara Diocese of Colima (erected)
28 January 1961Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Archdiocese of Guadalajara
Diocese of Autlán (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Archdiocese of Durango
Diocese of Zacatecas
Territorial Prelature of Jesús María (del Nayar) (erected)
30 April 1962Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Diocese of Tacámbaro
Diocese of Apatzingán (erected)
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Archdiocese of Guadalajara
Diocese of Ciudad Guzmán (erected)
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Colima
Archdiocese of Guadalajara
Diocese of San Juan de los Lagos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950280,000281,00099.6%92923,04315130ap1951
1966375,745387,26297.0%16021622,319622133ap1967
1970449,768.0%13131340529135ap1971
1976380,504422,78490.0%11251173,2521220039ap1977
1980466,500490,00095.2%10661124,165619341ap1981
1990563,171672,47383.7%10171085,214717345ap1991
1999549,534676,96581.2%12991383,9821523251ap2000
2000608,972676,63690.0%12591344,5441420952ap2001
2001621,152690,16890.0%12491334,6701421252ap2002
2002633,636697,06990.9%12391324,8001421152ap2003
2003639,338704,03990.8%12281304,9171824852ap2004
2004645,092711,07990.7%12471314,9241223852ap2005
2006591,262649,73991.0%12871354,3791422952ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Nov 2013