Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rogelio Sánchez González

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Colima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1921BornSan José de Gracia
25 Mar 194422.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 197251.3AppointedBishop of Colima, México
4 Oct 197251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Colima, México
8 Feb 198058.8ResignedBishop of Colima, México
22 Dec 201190.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for Rogelio Sánchez González:
Bishop Rogelio Sánchez González (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Colima

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: CB, 23 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013