Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Hernández Hurtado

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán

Titular Bishop of Vicus Pacati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1920BornArandas
26 Dec 194323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
13 Jan 195837.0AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
11 May 195837.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
6 Sep 197049.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
12 Dec 197453.9ResignedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
12 Dec 197453.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Dec 197453.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
20 Mar 199776.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Oct 200483.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Hernández Hurtado:
Bishop Adolfo Hernández Hurtado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015