Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tapachula

Dioecesis Tapacolensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
19 June 1957ErectedDiocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) (Arriaga, Villaflores, Villa Corzo, Tonala, La Concordia, Angel A. Corzo, Pijijiapam, Mapestepec, Motozintla, Siltepec, Bellavista, La Grandeza, Bejucal, Amatenango, Porvenir, Mazapa, Escuintla, Aeacoyagua, Acapetagua, Huixtla, Pueblo Nuevo, Tuzantan, ...) Diocese of Tapachula (erected)
27 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) (Cintalapa, Jiquipilas, Ocozocoautla, Tecpatán, Francisco León, Chapultenango, Ishuatán, Tapilula, Rayón, Pantepec, Pueblo Nuevo Solistahuacán, Ocotepec, Tapalapa, Coapilla, Copainalá, Jitötol, Bochil, Chicoasén, Berriozabál, San Fernando , Osumacinta, ...)
Diocese of Tabasco (Reforma, Sunuapan, Pichuacalco, Juárez, Ixtapangajoya, and Parts of Ostuacan, Solosuchiapa, and Ixtacomitán)
Diocese of Tapachula (Villa Flores, Villa Corzo, Angel Albino Corzo (Jaltenango) and La Concordia)
Diocese of Tuxtla Gutiérrez (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tapachula (from Antequera, Oaxaca)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966375,553390,55396.2%1752217,070115010ap1967
1968375,553390,55396.2%2142515,02212508ap1971
1976416,000520,00080.0%3744110,14647618ap1977
1980479,000589,00081.3%3243613,30548223ap1981
1990823,036930,45188.5%4825016,460211232ap1991
19991,058,4941,202,38888.0%7097913,398910638ap2000
20001,093,1981,238,45988.3%6197015,617910638ap2001
20011,125,4501,270,45988.6%6997814,428911038ap2002
20021,271,7501,325,41696.0%6287018,167811238ap2003
20031,350,1801,435,12094.1%7187917,090810941ap2004
20041,365,2301,524,12089.6%7588316,448810341ap2005
20101,498,0001,714,00087.4%8989715,443813442ap2011
20141,488,0001,773,00083.9%901110114,7321113147ap2015
2017853,6001,260,70067.7%9881068,052813053ap2018
2020756,3432,986,65725.3%10681146,634815050ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 185, to Page 187
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 99, Page 57, to Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 9 Nov 2023