Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Calderón Calderón

Auxiliary Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

Titular Bishop of Iomnium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1966 Born
16 Feb 199124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
5 Jul 201246.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
5 Jul 201246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
5 Oct 201246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium

MicroData Summary for Jaime Calderón Calderón
Bishop Jaime Calderón Calderón (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChurintzio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,600

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast